HAWES DOWN PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1049656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 01 July 2021 732 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required