Accounts and annual returns SEXUAL AND DOMESTIC ABUSE & RAPE ADVICE CENTRE (BURTON & DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1049759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window