Financial history SEXUAL AND DOMESTIC ABUSE & RAPE ADVICE CENTRE (BURTON & DISTRICT)

Charity number: 1049759
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £247.75k £270.90k £238.96k £413.11k £462.18k
Total expenditure £214.11k £214.11k £278.88k £237.56k £199.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.72k £151.66k £149.44k £149.44k £214.07k