Trustees WE THE CURIOUS LIMITED
Charity number: 1049954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICK JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fabian Breckels | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Barry Parsons | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ross Fairley | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Lara Lalemi | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Betts | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sujata McNab | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Stringer | Trustee | 24 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Sims | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathreena Kurian | Trustee | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SPROXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.