UXBRIDGE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1050177
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £23.69k £23.93k £23.07k £19.85k £14.58k
Total expenditure £26.59k £22.37k £26.82k £21.38k £14.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k N/A £500 N/A