NORTH PLYMOUTH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1050309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £116.16k £112.14k £92.97k £97.03k £72.60k
Total expenditure £98.32k £111.40k £106.62k £102.06k £68.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.55k £800