Financial history THE LEPROSY MISSION ENGLAND, WALES, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN

Charity number: 1050327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.73m £9.07m £7.79m £8.06m £9.99m
Total expenditure £7.85m £7.96m £7.98m £8.15m £7.68m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £418.09k £982.64k £633.55k £54.48k £1.12m
Income - Donations and legacies £7.71m £8.79m £7.77m £8.04m £9.86m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.79k £12.32k £18.90k £18.18k £15.04k
Income - Other £0 £264.33k £0 £212 £116.70k
Income - Legacies £2.26m £3.48m £2.45m £2.34m £3.88m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.09m £6.03m £6.11m £6.12m £5.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.76m £1.93m £1.86m £2.03m £2.02m
Expenditure - Governance £55.11k £77.03k £0 £77.03k £78.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £4.94m £0 £0 £4.38m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.55k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0