Financial history BERKSHIRE WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 1050484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.19m £1.13m £1.40m £1.19m £1.71m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.12m £1.04m £1.16m £1.26m
Income from government contracts £597.86k £569.76k £562.34k £676.72k £767.04k
Income from government grants £182.22k £142.77k £16.30k £51.04k £172.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.88k £50.43k £313.47k £65.80k £226.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.07m £1.09m £1.12m £1.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £226.65k
Income - Investment £8.56k £1.18k £3.59k £2.62k £852
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.08m £1.01m £1.12m £1.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.78k £37.98k £35.31k £37.94k £42.32k
Expenditure - Governance £37.01k £38.98k £38.01k £4.37k £36.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £61.31k £45.95k £21.13k £3.12k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0