Trustees BERKSHIRE WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 1050484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET RICE-JONES Chair
None on record
Beverley Moses-Mulrooney Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Minaz Beddall Trustee 21 January 2020
CHOLSEY VOLUNTEERS TRUST
Recently registered
THE SINODUN PLAYERS AMATEUR DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Emma Rachel O'Kerry Trustee 23 October 2019
None on record
Fiona Jones Trustee 29 March 2017
None on record
Kathryn Baddeley Trustee 15 January 2015
None on record
PENNY SPINKS Trustee 03 April 2013
None on record
MRS JAN COOPER Trustee
None on record
DIANA HUNT Trustee
None on record