ROCK COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1050624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.97k £44.22k £42.26k £44.84k £43.57k
Total expenditure £34.66k £31.37k £34.70k £41.29k £41.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A