Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF ACCOUNTING TECHNICIANS

Charity number: 1050724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £37.20m £30.54m £31.63m £29.37m £32.28m
Total expenditure £37.01m £29.77m £30.61m £25.84m £25.35m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £639.44k £538.50k £558.76k £443.43k £675.66k
Income - Charitable activities £35.61m £29.25m £30.30m £27.63m £30.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £245.78k £239.50k £223.02k £157.93k £212.78k
Income - Other £709.00k £513.04k £546.42k £1.13m £480.08k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £36.13m £28.80m £29.72m £25.07m £24.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £255.49k £199.48k £190.51k £212.67k £240.39k
Expenditure - Governance £717.78k £573.90k £514.20k £339.43k £375.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £255.49k £199.48k £190.51k £212.67k £240.39k
Expenditure - Other £627.40k £770.36k £701.97k £555.86k £446.45k