FRIENDS OF EXNING SCHOOL

Charity number: 1050867
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £5.68k £10.06k £9.51k £5.42k £5.78k
Total expenditure £16.99k £9.35k £2.53k £4.56k £14.14k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.16k N/A N/A N/A