Financial history REDBRIDGE GUJARATI WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £172.64k £139.10k £73.62k £99.23k £68.60k
Total expenditure £159.93k £131.49k £71.14k £94.52k £64.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.56k £16.56k £16.56k £16.56k £16.56k