BOUNDARY COMMUNITY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1050926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £43.67k £26.53k £16.88k £37.60k £47.31k
Total expenditure £50.39k £24.86k £18.62k £34.39k £39.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £38.05k £4.00k £5.50k £22.80k £30.31k