ST. MARY SHEET CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1050935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required