Accounts and annual returns HINDERWELL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1050937
Charity reporting is overdue by 1402 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 306 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 306 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1037 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1037 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1402 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1402 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required