BISHOP LONSDALE PTFA

Charity number: 1050957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.00k £6.32k £15.42k £18.16k £12.62k
Total expenditure £10.12k £3.98k £17.19k £14.62k £10.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A