Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF BEACONSFIELD

Charity number: 1051012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 March 2022 319 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 November 2020 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 30 August 2019 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 26 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required