THE FRIENDS OF ST. OSMUNDS CHURCH, MELBURY OSMOND

Charity number: 1051333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.33k £3.94k £4.08k £3.17k £1.67k
Total expenditure £5.54k £6.84k £800 £3.68k £338
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A