Financial history 3RD NORTHOLT (ST BARNABAS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1051462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.63k £7.15k £4.82k £12.18k £6.50k
Total expenditure £2.32k £4.09k £2.33k £12.42k £4.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A