BARNSLEY GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity number: 1051635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £243 £182 £182 £324 £324
Total expenditure £456 £358 £358 £407 £407
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A