Accounts and annual returns AMNESTY INTERNATIONAL UK SECTION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 January 2021 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window