Trustees AMNESTY INTERNATIONAL UK SECTION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Catherine Warren Trustee 25 September 2021
FAIRSHARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Subathra Devi Shanmuganathan Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
HELEN MOULINOS Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Awmaima Amrayaf Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Shirah Zirabamuzale Mansaray Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Dr Senthorun Raj Trustee 10 July 2021
None on record
Ciara Rose Aman Garcha Trustee 10 July 2021
None on record
Frederica Nisha Kumari De Silva Trustee 11 July 2020
None on record
Andrew William Lines Trustee 09 January 2020
None on record
Dr Deborah Jane Katharine Charnock Trustee 14 December 2019
None on record