Accounts and annual returns OAKWOOD PRIMARY PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1051855
Charity reporting is overdue by 1024 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 294 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 294 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 659 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 659 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1024 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1024 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 April 2021 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 02 December 2019 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window