Financial history ECLECTIC VOICES SOCIETY

Charity number: 1052289
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £36.92k £36.13k £34.13k £18.28k £33.36k
Total expenditure £36.49k £37.71k £29.62k £16.49k £36.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A