EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY BOAT PROJECT

Charity number: 1052320
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 2182 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Overdue Overdue by 2182 days
Annual return 31 March 2014 09 June 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 09 January 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 03 September 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 14 October 2011 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required