Financial history South Tyneside and Sunderland NHS Foundation Trust Charitable Funds

Charity number: 1052366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.00m £1.56m £1.05m £1.01m £1.98m
Total expenditure £587.67k £1.19m £998.61k £1.22m £848.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £842.34k £1.40m £904.27k £870.89k £1.82m
Income - Other trading activities £10.07k £22.88k £20.92k £6.72k £6.00k
Income - Charitable activities £91.60k £82.62k £70.82k £75.22k £69.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £56.09k £61.93k £58.05k £58.85k £82.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £419.68k £342.87k £159.18k £130.81k £110.22k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £522.98k £1.13m £964.86k £1.16m £824.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds £64.69k £60.15k £33.75k £60.50k £23.80k
Expenditure - Governance £8.23k £6.94k £6.57k £6.88k £19.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.60k £17.96k £17.87k £17.97k £18.54k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0