THE FRIENDS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL LONG DITTON

Charity number: 1052633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 November 2020 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required