Accounts and annual returns TIPTON CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1052764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window