Financial history TIPTON CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1052764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £70.40k £54.64k £51.05k £70.54k £75.48k
Total expenditure £73.35k £63.67k £57.24k £56.64k £66.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.75k £28.62k