Financial history LIVING WATERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (LEIGH)

Charity number: 1052988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £15.15k £10.07k £5.25k £4.73k £360
Total expenditure £15.85k £19.53k £4.08k £3.97k £2.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A