THE HALL FOR CORNWALL TRUST

Charity number: 1053028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 30/06/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.18m £6.37m £10.48m £6.84m £6.39m
Total expenditure £6.17m £6.38m £7.83m £890.53k £1.02m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £195.00k £195.00k £852.36k £428.20k £793.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £221.16k £105.92k £2.90m £6.21m £5.29m
Income - Other trading activities £706.95k £683.76k £744.70k £50.83k £86.80k
Income - Charitable activities £5.19m £5.42m £6.61m £491.55k £864.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.49k £7.89k £6.78k £4.24k £6.53k
Income - Other £53.99k £153.47k £220.44k £80.84k £147.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.65m £5.70m £6.85m £682.27k £796.18k
Expenditure - Raising funds £517.70k £572.11k £645.79k £109.81k £93.95k
Expenditure - Governance £15.57k £23.52k £28.44k £29.15k £18.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £105.86k £337.36k £98.45k £128.82k