Governing document Currys Charitable Foundation
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/02/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/09/2015 as amended on 20 Aug 2018 as amended on 16 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.