Accounts and annual returns GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE

Charity number: 1053294
Charity reporting is overdue by 207 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2022 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 March 2022 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 March 2021 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 December 2019 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 December 2019 59 days late Download Open in new window