Financial history GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE

Charity number: 1053294
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £191.98k £164.18k £150.82k £123.15k £117.55k
Total expenditure £171.55k £176.43k £149.14k £83.50k £114.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £25.00k N/A