Trustees FOXCOTE MANOR SOCIETY
Charity number: 1053410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Jon Irwin Fuller | Chair | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JOHN CARPENTER | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT ALEXANDER FRANK BARNES | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Keith Smith | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Owen | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Murrie Rodgers | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Richard Grindley | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.