Accounts and annual returns KATHLEEN NORA OSBORNE'S CHARITY FOR PODIMORE CHURCH NO 2

Charity number: 1053463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 February 2020 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required