Accounts and annual returns CAMEO

Charity number: 1053528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 March 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 March 2019 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window