Financial history CAMEO

Charity number: 1053528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £273.33k £228.78k £269.57k £249.82k £104.75k
Total expenditure £235.13k £239.57k £228.20k £237.09k £132.87k
Income from government contracts £73.85k £33.98k £41.57k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A £80.24k