ARCHDIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM CATHOLIC HANDICAPPED FELLOWSHIP OXFORD

Charity number: 1053573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.34k £8.70k £11.47k £10.37k £3.81k
Total expenditure £14.90k £8.35k £11.90k £10.18k £628
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A