Dogfen lywodraethu RUSKIN MILL LAND TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 18 OCTOBER 1996, 17 AUGUST 2007 AND 24 MAY 2010, AND BY DECLARATION DATED 28 MARCH 2003.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS THOUGH TRAINING IN THE AREAS OF THE ARTS, CRAFTS, AGRICULTURE AND ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO THE INDICATIONS AND INSIGHTS OF RUDOLF STEINER IN THESE AREAS. 2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE PRACTICE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THOSE AREAS OF EDUCATION PROVIDED THAT ALL RESEARCH FINDINGS WILL BE WIDELY DISSEMINATED.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.