COMMUNITY ACTION HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 1053806
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Southgate Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Margaret Geary Trustee 13 November 2013
AGE UK PORTSMOUTH Received: On time
THE E C ROBERTS CENTRE Received: On time
Richard Andrew Barritt Trustee 19 December 2019 None on record
Katharine Ann English Trustee 27 January 2021 None on record
Savannah King Trustee 03 March 2017 None on record
OLIVER ROWE Trustee None on record
Julie Ann Amies Trustee 17 October 2019 None on record
COLIN BROWN Trustee 09 December 2013 None on record