Financial history THE CARTESIANS ACADEMY SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL- CASS

Charity number: 1053832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.68k £9.91k £3.75k £17.74k £6.16k
Total expenditure £5.61k £9.91k £3.65k £13.45k £6.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.65k N/A