Accounts and annual returns GRAND BAY (UK) DOMINICA COMMUNITY ALLIANCE

Charity number: 1053840
Charity reporting is overdue by 879 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 148 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 148 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 513 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 513 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 879 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 879 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 February 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required