Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S AID FEDERATION OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1054154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window