THE FIRST STEP LTD

Charity number: 1054533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 23 November 2016 On time Download