Accounts and annual returns BOX CLEVER THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1054553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 28 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window