Accounts and annual returns BULGARIAN SUPPORT FUND

Charity number: 1054734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required