Trustees SNEYD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1054740
Charity reporting is up to date (67 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH MICHAEL HASTINGS Chair 20 September 1996
WALSALL COMMUNITY CONSORTIUM
Received: On time
Christopher Roberts Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
ELIZABETH ANNE HAZELL Trustee 11 August 2016
None on record
Louise Ann Harrison Councillor Trustee 10 July 2013
None on record
TREVOR SIMMS Trustee 20 February 1996
None on record