EDEN VALLEY RAILWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1054760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.00k £20.72k £20.82k £22.13k £19.24k
Total expenditure £28.35k £24.58k £23.67k £19.21k £15.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A